Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795608 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795608



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 228
31.07.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Description Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.04.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
02.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.04.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.11.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 58
06.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
06.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
02.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.05.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 57
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 39
19.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2