Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795608


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.08.2019 Change - applicant published on  04.09.2019  [2019/36]
11.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.04.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.11.2018 First examination report
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
12.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
22.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
09.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication