Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2795608 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280070026 EP12813062



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104115218BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2017B
CN104115218 22.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113331955 20.12.2011
WO2012FI51253 18.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2795608Global Dossier 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113331955 20.12.2011
WO2012FI51253 18.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013093190Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113331955 20.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9207837Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2013155116 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113331955 20.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI575442B 21.03.2017B
TW201342188 16.10.2013A
Priority number Date
US201113331955 20.12.2011