Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795609

EP2795609 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR GRAPHICALLY TRANSITIONING BETWEEN MULTIPLE PROGRAM INTERFACE LEVELS OF A PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / PARETTI, Christopher
394 Laidley Street
San Francisco, California 94131 / US
02 / LINDMEIER, William
1387 Hayes Street Apt 3
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12813064.819.12.2012
WO2012FI51269
Priority number, dateUS20111333197520.12.2011         Original published format: US201113331975
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093201
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795609
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/14, G06F3/0481
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT FÜR EINEN GRAFISCHEN ÜBERGANG ZWISCHEN MEHREREN PROGRAMMSCHNITTSTELLENEBENEN EINES PROGRAMMS[2014/44]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR GRAPHICALLY TRANSITIONING BETWEEN MULTIPLE PROGRAM INTERFACE LEVELS OF A PROGRAM[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR EFFECTUER DES TRANSITIONS GRAPHIQUES ENTRE DE MULTIPLES NIVEAUX D'INTERFACE DE PROGRAMME D'UN PROGRAMME[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
09.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/48]
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7702568  (TANPOCO ALVIN F [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * column 12, paragraph 14 - paragraph 54; figure 6 * [I] 1-20;
 [X]  - Supratim Nayak ET AL, "Photofold", (20110723), URL: http://dribbble.com/shots/324781-Photofold, (20130211), XP055052921 [X] 1,8,15 * the whole document *