Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2013093520

WO2013093520 - HEATABLE CARBON NANOTUBE AEROGELS, XEROGELS AND GELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2014
Database last updated on 25.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.01.2015  [2015/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Bio Nano Centre Limited
338 Euston Road
London NW1 3BT / GB
For all designated states
King Abdulaziz University
PO Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / BASAHEL, Sulaiman Nassir
King Abdulaziz University
P.O. Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
02 / MOSTAFA, Mohamed Mokhtar Mohamed
King Abdulaziz University
P.O. Box 80203
Jeddah 21589 / SA
03 / GARCIA GALLASTEGUI, Ainara
Imperial College London
South Kensington Campus
London SW7 2AZ / GB
04 / SCHAFFER, Milo
Imperial College London
South Kensington Campus
London SW7 2AZ / GB
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12813084.621.12.2012
WO2012GB53261
Priority number, dateGB2011002219822.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201122198
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013093520
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2013/26]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleEnglish:HEATABLE CARBON NANOTUBE AEROGELS, XEROGELS AND GELS
French:AÉROGELS, XÉROGELS ET GELS DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, CHAUFFABLES
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/03]
23.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/03]
28.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/03]
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010019942  (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,39 * paragraphs [0061] , [0102] , [0120] * * example 8 * [I] 2-5,40,42,46;
 [XI]  - WORSLEY M A ET AL, "Properties of single-walled carbon nanotube-based aerogels as a function of nanotube loading", ACTA MATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 57, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.ACTAMAT.2009.07.012, ISSN 1359-6454, (20090806), pages 5131 - 5136, (20090806), XP026601044 [X] 1,2,6,7,42 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,46

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actamat.2009.07.012
 [A]  - RYAN R KOHLMEYER ET AL, "Preparation of stable carbon nanotube aerogels with high electrical conductivity and porosity", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 49, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2011.02.001, ISSN 0008-6223, (20110225), pages 2352 - 2361, (20110208), XP028368363 [A] 1-7,39,40,42,46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2011.02.001
by applicant   - SHEKHAR S., "Correlated Electrical Breakdown in Arrays of High Density Aligned CNT", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2011), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1063/1.3600664, page 243121, XP012141094

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3600664
    - XIAO L. ET AL., "Flexible, Stretchable, Transparent Carbon Nanotube Thin Film Loudspeakers", NANO LETT., (2008), vol. 8, page 4539,
    - POP E., "The Role of Electrical and Thermal Contact Resistance for Joule Breakdown of Single-wall Carbon Nanotubes", NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 19, page 295202, XP020136758
    - MAUNE H., "Thermal Resistance of the Nanoscale Constrictions Between Carbon Nanotubes and Solid Substrates", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2006), vol. 89, page 013109,
    - CHIU H. Y., "Ballistic Phonon Thermal Transport in Multiwalled Carbon Nanotubes", PHYS. REV. LETT., (2006), vol. 95, page 226101,
    - CHEN Y.; HADDON R. C.; FANG S.; RAO A. M.; EKLUND P. C.; LEE W. H.; DICKEY E. C.; GRULKE E. A.; PENDERGRASS J. C.; CHAVAN A., J. MATER. RES., (1998), vol. 13, page 2423,
    - PEKKER, S.; SALVETAT J.-P.; JAKAB E.; BONARD J.-M.; FORRO L. J., PHYS. CHEM. B, (2001), vol. 105, page 7938,
    - PENICAUD A.; POULIN P.; DERRE A.; ANGLARET E.; PETIT P., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, page 8,
    - WEI L.; ZHANG Y., CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (2007), vol. 446, page 142,
    - GARCIA-GALLASTEGUI A.; OBIETA I.; BUSTERO I.; IMBULUZQUETA G.; ARBIOL J.; MIRANDA J. I.; AIZPURUA J. M., CHEM. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, page 4433,
    - FOGDEN S.; VERDEJO R.; COTTAM B.; SHAFFER M., CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (2008), vol. 460, pages 162 - 167,
    - VERDEJO R.; LAMORINIERE S.; COTTAM B.; BISMARCK A.; SHAFFER M., CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), pages 513 - 515,
    - LIU C. ET AL., POLYMER, (2003), vol. 44, pages 7529 - 7532,
    - BERGIN S. D.; NICOLOSI V.; STREICH P. 3; GIORDANI S.; SUN Z. 1; WINDLE A.H. 4; RYAN P. 5; NIRMALRAJ P.P.N. 5; WANG Z.T. 4; CARPENT, ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2008), vol. 20, no. 10, page 1876,
    - HORTIGUELA M. J .; RAMOS V.; LOPEZ-LACOMBA J. L.; FERRER M. L.; DEL MONTE F., BIOMATERIALS, (2008), vol. 29, page 94,
    - NABETA M.; SANO M., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, pages 1706 - 1708,
    - FUKUSHIMA T.; KOSAKA A.; ISHIMURA Y.; YAMAMOTO T.; TAKIGAWA T.; ISHII N.; AIDA T., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 300, page 2072,
    - LEROY C.M.; CARN F.; BACKOV R.; TRINQUECOSTE M.; DELHAES P., CARBON, (2007), vol. 45, pages 2307 - 2320,
    - BRYNING M. B.; MILKIE D. E.; ISLAM M.F .; HOUGH L. A.; KIKKAWA J. M.; YODH A. G., ADV. MATER., (2007), vol. 19, page 661,
    - NAKAGAWA K; YASUMURA Y.; THONGPRACHANB N.; SANO N., CHEMICAL ENGINEERING AND PROCESSING, (2011), vol. 50, pages 22 - 30,
    - ZOU J.; LIU J.; KARAKOTI A. S.; KUMAR A.; JOUNG D.; LI Q.; KHONDAKER S. I.; SEAL S.; ZHAI L., ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, pages 7293 - 7302,
    - ABARRATEGI A.; GUTIERREZ M. C.; MORENO-VICENTE C.; HORTIGUELA M. J .; RAMOS V.; LOPEZ-LACOMBA J. L.; FERRER M. L.; DEL MONTE F., BIOMATERIALS, (2008), vol. 29, page 94,
    - THONGPRACHANA N.; NAKAGAWAB K.; SANOC N.; CHARINPANITKULA T.; TANTHAPANICHAKOON W., MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (2008), vol. 112, pages 262 - 269,