Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782691

EP2782691 - SEALING ARRANGEMENT OF A BATTERY FILLING PORT USING A RIVET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/40]SEALED BATTERY
[2014/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2014/48]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAYAMA, Hiroyuki
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, of 1
Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / HARAYAMA, Takashi
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, of 1
Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
03 / KUSAMA, Kazuyuki
c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, of 1
Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12813092.921.11.2012
WO2012IB02429
Priority number, dateJP2011025768325.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011257683
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013076555
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2782691
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782691
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16B19/00, B21J15/04, F16B19/10, H01M2/36, H01M10/052
[2014/42]
Former International [2014/40]B21J15/04, F16B19/10, H01M2/36, H01M10/052
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG EINER BATTERIEEINFÜLLÖFFNUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NIETS[2015/18]
English:SEALING ARRANGEMENT OF A BATTERY FILLING PORT USING A RIVET[2014/42]
French:BATTERIE À BAC HERMÉTIQUE[2014/40]
Former [2014/40]ABGEDICHTETE BATTERIE
Former [2014/40]SEALED BATTERY
Entry into regional phase23.05.2014National basic fee paid 
23.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
28.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2015Fee for grant paid
23.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2014
Opposition(s)01.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AL29.04.2015
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.11.2012
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
TR29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2018/31]HU21.11.2012
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MK29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU21.11.2012
AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
BG29.04.2015
CY29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
MT29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SE29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
SM29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/50]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
IE21.11.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/37]AT29.04.2015
BE29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU21.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
LU21.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
MC29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SI29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
IT29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT29.04.2015
CZ29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
PL29.04.2015
RO29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
SK29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
EE29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT29.04.2015
DK29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT29.04.2015
ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
IS29.08.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES29.04.2015
FI29.04.2015
HR29.04.2015
LT29.04.2015
LV29.04.2015
NL29.04.2015
RS29.04.2015
NO29.07.2015
GR30.07.2015
PT31.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL29.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011072648  (YAMAUCHI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2010304214  (ITOH YUSUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]WO9712407  (BOLDER TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 8, line 5 - page 11, line 30 *;
 [AD]JP2003229118  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-7 * abstract *
by applicantJP2003229118