Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782992

EP2782992 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING ALGAE, IN PARTICULAR MICROALGAE, FROM AN AQUEOUS PHASE, AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2017  [2017/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIM Biotech GmbH
Am Kupfergraben 6
10117 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
GMB GmbH
Knappenstraße 1
01968 Senftenberg / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KRÜGER, Gerd
Lehnestraße 39
10621 Berlin / DE
02 / DALLWIG, Rainer
Landhausstraße 1
14476 Potsdam / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Morawski, Birgit
Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date12813287.520.11.2012
WO2012EP73088
Priority number, dateDE2011108713725.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011087137
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013076072
Date:30.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2782992
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/02, C12N1/12, C12M1/00, A01G33/00, B01D21/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ABTRENNEN VON ALGEN, INSBESONDERE MIKROALGEN AUS EINER WÄSSRIGEN PHASE UND EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS[2014/40]
English:METHOD FOR SEPARATING ALGAE, IN PARTICULAR MICROALGAE, FROM AN AQUEOUS PHASE, AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THIS METHOD[2014/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'ALGUES, NOTAMMENT DE MICROALGUES D'UNE PHASE AQUEUSE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCÉDÉ[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
27.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/18]
06.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009162919  (RADAELLI GUIDO [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9,12-18,25,26 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0056]; claims 1,7,13,18,22,23 * * paragraph [0071] *;
 [AD]US2002079270  (BORODYANSKI GENADY [IL] ET AL) [AD] 1,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE102009030712  (UNIV FRIEDRICH ALEXANDER ER [DE]; SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010052242  (FIM BIOTECH GMBH [DE]; KRUEGER GERD [DE]; DALLWIG RAINER [DE]) [A] 13,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2011157902  (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI]; MALM ANNIKA [FI]; TANNER REIJO [FI]) [XP] 1-6,9,12-14,16,25,26 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SENGCO MARIO R ET AL, "Controlling harmful algal blooms through clay Flocculation", JOURNAL OF EUKARYOTIC MICROBIOLOGY, (200403), vol. 51, no. 2, ISSN 1066-5234, pages 169 - 172, XP002694676 [X] 1,12-14,25,26 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SENGCO MARIO R ET AL, "Removal of red- and brown-tide cells using clay flocculation. I. Laboratory culture experiments with Gymnodinium breve and Aureococcus anophagefferens", MARINE ECOLOGY PROGRESS SERIES, (20010126), no. 210, ISSN 0171-8630, pages 41 - 53, XP002694677 [X] 1,12-14,25,26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3354/meps210041
by applicantDE102009030712
 US6524486