Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814804

EP2814804 - AMORPHOUS, HIGH GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE COPOLYESTER COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saudi Basic Industries Corporation
P.O. Box 5101
Riyadh 11422 / SA
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / KANNAN, Ganesh
1 Lexan Lane
Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Stiebe, Lars Magnus , et al
Balder
Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5
28046 Madrid / ES
[2017/05]
Former [2014/52]Stiebe, Lars Magnus , et al
Balder IP Law, S.L.
Paseo de la Castellana 120
28046 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date12813625.611.12.2012
[2017/05]
WO2012US68913
Priority number, dateUS20121339721015.02.2012         Original published format: US201213397210
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122666
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814804
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2814804
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/09, C07C63/26, C08G63/185, C08J11/14, C08J11/24, C08L67/02
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AMORPHE COPOLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HOHER GLASÜBERGANGSTEMPERATUR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ARTIKEL DARAUS[2014/52]
English:AMORPHOUS, HIGH GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE COPOLYESTER COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES THEREOF[2014/52]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE COPOLYESTER AMORPHE À TEMPÉRATURE DE TRANSITION VITREUSE ÉLEVÉE, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS ET ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS AVEC CES COMPOSITIONS[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2016Fee for grant paid
15.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2015
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2012
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU11.12.2012
AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2019/30]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US3547888  (SARDESSAI KASHINATH S ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-10,13 * example 5 * [A] 15,16,18,19 [Y] 5,6,11 [I] 12,14,17,20;
 [IA]JPH0987370  (TEIJIN LTD) [I] 1-4,7-10,12-14,17,20 * example 5; claim 1 * [A] 5,6,11,15,16,18,19;
 [Y]US5413681  (TUSTIN GERALD C [US] ET AL) [Y] 5,6,11 * column 1, line 30 - column 15, line 53; examples 1, 5 *;
 [A]US5268420  (NISHIMURA AKIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * example 4; table 3 *;
 [A]US3634089  (HAMB FREDRICK LYNN) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 66 - column 2, line 66; example 7 *;
 [A]WO2007076384  (BP CORP NORTH AMERICA INC [US]; ANDERSON RONALD L [US]; SIKKENGA DAVID) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0067] *
by applicantUS2010016837
 US3859364
 US2780609
 US2830966
 US2873262
 US3102135
 BE731258
 NL6905547