Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795640

EP2795640 - CORROSION-RESISTANT COATING SYSTEM FOR A DRY-TYPE TRANSFORMER CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Bandeep
317 Hope Valley Road
Knightdale, NC 27545 / US
02 / HARTMANN; Thomas, A.
1170 Jefferson Oaks Court - Unit 24
Forest, VA 24551 / US
03 / BALLARD, Robert, C.
400 century Ct.
Wytheville, VA 24382 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date12813652.019.12.2012
WO2012US70609
Priority number, dateUS20111333628323.12.2011         Original published format: US201113336283
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096442
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795640
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/23
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGES BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN TROCKENTRANSFORMATORKERN[2014/44]
English:CORROSION-RESISTANT COATING SYSTEM FOR A DRY-TYPE TRANSFORMER CORE[2014/44]
French:SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT RÉSISTANT À LA CORROSION POUR UN C UR DE TRANSFORMATEUR DE TYPE SEC[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201706   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011248808  (SINGH BANDEEP [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,8-20;
 [Y]US2002084879  (WEBER BENJAMIN [DE], et al) [Y] 8,9,20 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2010112081  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [Y] 4,9-20 * abstract * * page 1, lines 9-31 *;
 [Y]US5275645  (TERNOIR LEONARD R [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,18,19 * abstract * * column 4, lines 3-11 * * table 1 * * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 25 *
by applicantWO2010011208