Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798751

EP2798751 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER AWARE RECEIVE DIVERSITY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / GOPALAN, Ravi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / RAO, Varsha S.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / KANAMARLAPUDI, Sitaramanjaneyulu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12813679.320.12.2012
WO2012US71056
Priority number, dateUS201161581047P28.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161581047 P
US20121354228805.07.2012         Original published format: US201213542288
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101680
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798751
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/08
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUR VORRICHTUNG FÜR LEISTUNGSBEWUSSTE EMPFANGSDIVERSITÄTSSTEUERUNG[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER AWARE RECEIVE DIVERSITY CONTROL[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DIVERSITÉ DE RÉCEPTION SENSIBLE À LA PUISSANCE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
04.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/37]
09.04.2019Date of oral proceedings
23.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/37]
23.04.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2006084461  (SEKIYA MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,10,19,28 * abstract * * figures 4,8,9 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0093] * [A] 6,7,15,16,24,25,33,34 [I] 2-5,8,9,11-14,17,18,20-23,26,27,29-32,35,36;
 [XI]US2004253955  (LOVE ROBERT T [US] ET AL) [X] 1,10,19,28 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11-18,20-27,29-36;
 [A]WO2010062140  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]; LEI HAIPENG [CN]; LI XIAOQIANG [CN]) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *