Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798901

EP2798901 - CLIENT-ASSISTED TARGET MULTICAST AREA DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ANCHAN, Kirankumar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Catesby, Olivia Joanne
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date12813717.126.12.2012
WO2012US71660
Priority number, dateUS201161581024P28.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161581024 P
US20121372216420.12.2012         Original published format: US201213722164
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101834
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798901
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/00, H04W72/00, H04W64/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:CLIENT-UNTERSTÜTZTE MULTICAST-ZIELBEREICHSDETEKTION[2014/45]
English:CLIENT-ASSISTED TARGET MULTICAST AREA DETECTION[2014/45]
French:DÉTECTION DE ZONE DE MULTIDIFFUSION CIBLE ASSISTÉE PAR CLIENT[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
17.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
25.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2011035454  (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL [CN], et al) [X] 1-8,12-15 * page 1 - page 17; figures 1-5 * [I] 9-11;
 [P]EP2482513  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [P] * paragraphs [0012] , [ 0017] , [ 0018] , [ 0099] , [ 0100] , [ 0106] , [ 0113] , [ 0114]; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO2011006437  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 19 *;
 [P]EP2456237  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [P] * paragraphs [0093] - [0096] *;
 [A]WO0139443  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 5 * * page 25, line 17 - page 31, line 13; figure 4 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Numbering, addressing and identification (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.003, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V9.0.0, pages 1 - 72, XP050361768 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [15.3] *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and Architecture; Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (MBMS); Architecture and functional description (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.246, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090601), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 61, XP050363428 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [3.1], [8.1.1], [8.1.2] *