Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795710

EP2795710 - REDOX FLOW BATTERY WITH EXTERNAL SUPPLY LINE AND/OR DISPOSAL LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / DÖTSCH, Christian
Elsa-Brändström-Str. 76
46045 Oberhausen / DE
02 / BERTHOLD, Sascha
Nohlstr. 228
46045 Oberhausen / DE
03 / SEIPP, Thorsten
Hansbergstr. 25
44141 Dortmund / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date12813850.020.12.2012
WO2012EP76453
Priority number, dateDE20111012201023.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011122010
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092898
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795710
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/18, H01M8/241, H01M8/0273, H01M8/04082, H01M8/04276, H01M8/04186, H01M8/24
[2019/38]
Former International [2014/44]H01M8/18, H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:REDOX-FLOW-BATTERIE MIT AUSSENLIEGENDER VERSORGUNGSLEITUNG UND/ODER ENTSORGUNGSLEITUNG[2014/44]
English:REDOX FLOW BATTERY WITH EXTERNAL SUPPLY LINE AND/OR DISPOSAL LINE[2014/44]
French:BATTERIE À CIRCULATION D'OXYDO-RÉDUCTION AVEC LIGNE D'ALIMENTATION ET/OU LIGNE D'ÉVACUATION EXTERNES[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2014National basic fee paid 
20.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
10.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008116248  (REDFLOW PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-11,13,14 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 10 * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 30 * * claim 1 * * figures 5-10 * [I] 6;
 [X]WO9939397  (CHEMIECO S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,4,7-14 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 16, lines 1-4 * * page 19, line 17 - page 21, line 18 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0814527  (KASHIMA KITA ELECTRIC POWER CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *
 [X]  - PONCE-DE-LEON ET AL, "Characterization of the reaction environment in a filter-press redox flow reactor", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20070503), vol. 52, no. 19, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2007.02.080, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 5815 - 5823, XP022059446 [X] 1,3-5,7-11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * figures 1a,c,2 * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2007.02.080
by applicantEP0051766
 US2004170893