Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2732726

EP2732726 - Faucet-door for a sink or countertop [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 23.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abello Jimenez, Juan Antonio
C/ Alfredo Kraus, 26
29580 Cártama (MÁLAGA) / ES
[2017/12]
Former [2014/21]For all designated states
Abello Jimenez, Juan Antonio
C/ Alfredo Kraus 29
29580 Cártama Estacion (Málaga) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel , et al
Clarke, Modet & Co.
Suero de Quiñones, 34-36
28002 Madrid / ES
[2016/37]
Former [2014/21]Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel , et al
Clarke, Modet & Co.
C/ Goya, 11
28001 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date12815030.704.07.2012
[2016/37]
WO2012ES70492
Priority number, dateES20110030765U15.07.2011         Original published format: ES 201130765 U
ES20120030534U17.05.2012         Original published format: ES 201230534 U
[2014/21]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013011177
Date:24.01.2013
Language:ES
[2013/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2732726
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2732726
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
ES24.01.2013
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47B77/06
[2014/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABLAUFTÜR FÜR EINE SPÜLE ODER ARBEITSPLATTE[2014/21]
English:Faucet-door for a sink or countertop[2014/21]
French:ROBINET-PORTE POUR ÉVIER OU PLAN DE TRAVAIL[2014/21]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2014Translation filed 
04.02.2014National basic fee paid 
04.02.2014Search fee paid 
04.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/21]
05.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2016Fee for grant paid
03.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2016
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201403   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2017/34]
Former [2017/32]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
NL14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH05148871  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US2003088913  (UNDERBRINK JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040]; figures 3a, 5 *;
 [A]JP2002194788  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US5778273  (BEN-YAACOV SHLOMO [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 6 - line 16; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2594938  (LEAVITT JACK C) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5702115  (POOL L FRANK [US]) [A] 3,4 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5301376  (HERBERT NORBERT G [US]) [A] 4,5 * column 4, line 29 - line 40; figure 6 *
International search[Y]JP2002194788  ;
 [Y]US2003088913  (UNDERBRINK JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US5301376  (HERBERT NORBERT G [US]);
 [A]US2594938  (LEAVITT JACK C);
 [A]US5702115  (POOL L FRANK [US]);
 [A]US5778273  (BEN-YAACOV SHLOMO [US]);
 [A]US2007157378  (KENDALL JAMES W [US], et al)
 [Y]  - 1, Database accession no. 2003-375330, XP003031559