EP2796003 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR DIMMABLE GENERATION OF LIGHT BY MEANS OF LEDS, WITH COLOUR TEMPERATURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERMYN, Philip 18 Kirkwood Drive Durham DH1 4FF / GB | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12815674.2 | 20.12.2012 | [2017/37] | WO2012EP76359 | Priority number, date | DE20111089816 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011089816 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013092843 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796003 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796003 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H05B45/46 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B45/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR DIMMBAREN ERZEUGUNG VON LICHT MITTELS LEDS, MIT FARBTEMPERATUR-REGELUNG | [2017/16] | English: | METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR DIMMABLE GENERATION OF LIGHT BY MEANS OF LEDS, WITH COLOUR TEMPERATURE CONTROL | [2014/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DE CIRCUIT POUR PRODUIRE DE LA LUMIÈRE ATTÉNUABLE AU MOYENS DE LED AVEC RÉGULATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE DE COULEUR | [2014/44] |
Former [2014/44] | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR DIMMBAREN ERZEUGUNG VON LICHT MITTELS LEDS, MIT FARBTEMPERATUR - REGELUNG | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2012 | AL | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IE | 20.12.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2012 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010111123 (FUJIMURA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-5,8,9,12-14; | [X]AT506417 (LUNATONE IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,10 * page 4, line 8 - page 4, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2007129131 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 18, line 2 - page 18, line 5 * * figure 3a *; | [I]WO2010095084 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2375859 (YOUNG LIGHTING TECHNOLOGY CORP [TW]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * figure 11 * | by applicant | WO0154547 |