blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797569 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797569



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 201
20.12.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 17
20.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 11
20.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
20.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
20.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
01.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
21.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
26.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
20.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Description Search / examination 11
20.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
20.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
20.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
23.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.09.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1