Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797569 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797569



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 201
29.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.09.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
18.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
18.09.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
23.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
20.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
20.02.2017 Description Search / examination 11
20.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
20.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
24.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
01.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
20.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
20.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
20.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
20.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 11
20.12.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 17