blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2797569


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
31.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
23.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
22.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
20.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.06.2017 Change - German title published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
02.06.2017 Change - French title published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
20.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.12.2016 First examination report
16.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
26.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication