blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2797569 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP11195937 EP12815685



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9233059Global Dossier 12.01.2016B2
US2014373286 25.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP76480 20.12.2012
EP11195937 28.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2797569Global Dossier 25.10.2017B1
EP2797569 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP76480 20.12.2012
EP12815685 20.12.2012
EP11195937 28.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013098209Global Dossier 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11195937 28.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2609901Global Dossier 03.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11195937 28.12.2011