Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797569

EP2797569 - AQUEOUS OXIDIZING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Germany GmbH
Pfungstädter Str. 98-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMELZ, Sandra
Oberländerstr. 30A
97828 Marktheidenfeld / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Grit, Mustafa
Kao Germany GmbH
Pfungstädter Strasse 98-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12815685.820.12.2012
[2017/43]
WO2012EP76480
Priority number, dateEP2011019593728.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11195937
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098209
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797569
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797569
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/22, A61K8/368, A61K8/42, A61K8/49, A61Q5/04, A61Q5/08, A61Q5/10
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE OXIDIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2017/27]
English:AQUEOUS OXIDIZING COMPOSITION[2014/45]
French:COMPOSITION D'OXYDATION AQUEUSE[2017/27]
Former [2014/45]WÄSSRIGE OXIDATIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Former [2014/45]COMPOSITION OXYDANTE AQUEUSE
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
24.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2017Fee for grant paid
18.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2016
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2012
AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007151044  (CASSIER THORSTEN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3-9,12-14 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * * examples 5, 6 * [I] 2,10,11,15;
 [X]US2011104090  (KELTON CHRISTINE [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,13 * example 2 *;
 [X]FR2939672  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,13,15 * page 14, line 11 - page 15, line 15 *;
 [X]EP1920755  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,13,15 * example 1 *
Examination   - Jürgen Falbe ET AL, "Fettalkohole", RÖMPP CHEMIE LEXIKON, STUTTGART NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (19900101), pages 1336 - 1339, 016837, ISBN 978-3-13-734709-5, XP055377441