EP2791551 - TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE GEAR CHANGE CURVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE GEAR CHANGE CURVE | ||
[2017/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIOTTI, Walter c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 I-56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | 02 /
NESTI, Paolo c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 I-56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Mitola, Marco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 12815830.0 | 12.12.2012 | [2019/18] | WO2012IB57207 | Priority number, date | IT2011MI02250 | 13.12.2011 Original published format: IT MI20112250 | [2014/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013098689 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2791551 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2791551 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/56, F16H61/662 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
F16H61/66245 (EP,US);
F16H9/12 (US);
F16H55/563 (EP,US);
F16H63/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBESYSTEM MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DER SCHALTCHARAKTERISTIK | [2017/37] | English: | TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE GEAR CHANGE CURVE | [2017/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION AVEC MOYENS POUR COMMANDER LA CARACTÉRISTIQUE DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE | [2017/38] |
Former [2014/43] | GETRIEBESYSTEM MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DER GANGWECHSELKURVE | ||
Former [2014/43] | TRANSMISSION SYSTEM WITH DEVICE FOR REGULATING THE GEAR CHANGE CURVE | ||
Former [2014/43] | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE LA COURBE DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2012 | AL | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | GB | 12.12.2019 | IE | 12.12.2019 | LU | 12.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.12.2012 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.12.2012 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1132656 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050] *; | [I]EP1262690 (DOVERI MARCO [IT]) [I] 1,2,13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1a,1b,1c,2 *; | [A]EP1420195 (PIAGGIO & C SPA [IT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]WO2006119227 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 2; figures 3,4 * [I] 13; | [A]US2006258492 (WU CHUN-YI [TW], et al) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009227404 (BEYER MARK [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] * | Examination | JPS61171947 |