Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793705

EP2793705 - BONE MARROW ASPIRATION NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, RO, SM
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2018/43]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Biomet Biologics, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LANDRIGAN, Matthew D.
2412 W. Harbourside Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
02 / MCKALE, James M.
3598 Saybrook Ave.
Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Handley, Matthew Edward
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/43]
Former [2014/44]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12815914.219.12.2012
[2018/43]
WO2012US70561
Priority number, dateUS20111333279921.12.2011         Original published format: US201113332799
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096419
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793705
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793705
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NADEL ZUR ASPIRATION VON KNOCHENMARK[2014/44]
English:BONE MARROW ASPIRATION NEEDLE[2014/44]
French:AIGUILLE D'ASPIRATION DE MOELLE OSSEUSE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
09.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2018Fee for grant paid
11.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/35]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL24.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2004267154  (SUTTON JEFFREY KARL [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0043] * [A] 11-20;
 [Y]US2003139688  (LAMOUREUX GARY A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]US2007219460  (GOLDENBERG ALEC S [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0080]; figure 7 *