Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794725

EP2794725 - SILICONE HYDROGELS COMPRISING N-VINYL AMIDES AND HYDROXYALKYL (METH)ACRYLATES OR (METH)ACRYLAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc.
7500 Centurion Parkway
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
[2018/28]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc.
7500 Centurion Parkway
Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLI, Azaam
3489 Advantage Lane
Jacksonville, Florida 32277 / US
02 / VANDERLAAN, Douglas G.
1453 N. Market Street
Jacksonville, Florida 32206 / US
03 / FORD, James D.
515 Nassau Court
Orange Park, Florida 32203 / US
04 / JOSLIN, Scott L.
732 Mill Stream Road
Ponte Vedra Beach, Florida 32082 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12815932.420.12.2012
[2018/28]
WO2012US70895
Priority number, dateUS201161579693P23.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161579693 P
US201161579683P23.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161579683 P
US20121372026119.12.2012         Original published format: US201213720261
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096597
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794725
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794725
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08G77/442, C08F283/12, C08F290/06
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SILIKONHYDROGELE MIT N-VINYLAMIDEN UND HYDROXYALKYL (METH)ACRYLATEN ODER (METH)ACRYLAMIDEN[2014/44]
English:SILICONE HYDROGELS COMPRISING N-VINYL AMIDES AND HYDROXYALKYL (METH)ACRYLATES OR (METH)ACRYLAMIDES[2014/44]
French:HYDROGELS DE SILICONE COMPRENANT DES N-VINYLAMIDES ET DES (MÉTH)ACRYLATES OU (MÉTH)ACRYLAMIDES D'HYDROXYALKYLE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
27.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2018Fee for grant paid
01.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2017
Opposition(s)12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
MC11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
LU20.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
LU20.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SI11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
DK11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
SM11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
EE11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
SK11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
CZ11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RO11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL11.07.2018
AT11.07.2018
ES11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
LV11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
HR11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT11.07.2018
FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
PL11.07.2018
RS11.07.2018
SE11.07.2018
BG11.10.2018
NO11.10.2018
GR12.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI11.07.2018
LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
NO11.10.2018
IS11.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT11.07.2018
NL11.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL11.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[XD]US2010048847  (BROAD ROBERT ANDREW [GB]) [XD] 1-45 * claim 2; table 5 *;
 [A]US2011230589  (MAGGIO THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US2010249356  (RATHORE OSMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * claims 1-32 *
by applicantUS4136250
 US4153641
 US4260725
 US6867245
 US4139513
 US2010048847
 WO03022321
 WO03022322
 US2011237766
 US6020445
 US2010280146
 US3408429
 US3660545
 US4113224
 US4197266
 US6943203
    - J.V. CRIVELLO; K. DIETLIKER, Photoinitiators for Free Radical Cationic & Anionic Photopolymerization, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1998), vol. III
    - BARTON, CRC Handbook of Solubility Par., (1983), pages 85 - 87