Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2794725 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2794725



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 746
15.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
01.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
01.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 98
31.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 98
08.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
08.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
08.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 9
08.11.2017 Description Search / examination 14
08.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
27.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
27.02.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
27.02.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
27.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
27.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 91
14.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
14.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 99
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2