Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2794725


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
17.05.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
21.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
30.07.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.06.2018 (Expected) grant published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
05.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.07.2017 First examination report
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication