Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2797841 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2797841



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 243
30.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
19.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
19.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
12.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
12.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 8
12.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.08.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 11
06.08.2014 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
07.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
04.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 52
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
21.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
21.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 10
21.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 38
21.12.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3