Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2797841
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015011787Global Dossier 08.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20112449 30.12.2011
WO2012EP76748 21.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2797841Global Dossier 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20112449 30.12.2011
WO2012EP76748 21.12.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013098261Global Dossier 04.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20112449 30.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITMI20112449 01.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
ITMI20112449 30.12.2011