Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797841

EP2797841 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC-INORGANIC HYBRID SILICATES AND METAL-SILICATES WITH AN ORDERED STRUCTURE AND NEW HYBRID SILICATES AND METAL-SILICATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENI S.p.A.
Piazzale E. Mattei 1
00144 Rome / IT
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BELLUSSI, Giuseppe
Via Millo 14
I-29122 Piacenza / IT
02 / CARATI, Angela
Via F. Rosselli 6
I-20098 San Giuliano Milanese / IT
03 / MILLINI, Roberto
Strada Provinciale Sant A̋ngelo 17
I-20070 Cerro al Lambro / IT
04 / RIZZO, Caterina
Via E. Fermi 2/c
I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
05 / ZANARDI, Stefano
Via Leonardi 12 Trecate
I-28069 Novara / IT
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12816060.321.12.2012
WO2012EP76748
Priority number, dateIT2011MI0244930.12.2011         Original published format: IT MI20112449
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098261
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797841
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B37/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ORGANISCH-ANORGANISCHER HYBRIDSILIKATE UND METALLSILIKATE MIT GEORDNETER STRUKTUR SOWIE NEUE HYBRIDSILIKATE UND METALLSILIKATE[2014/45]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC-INORGANIC HYBRID SILICATES AND METAL-SILICATES WITH AN ORDERED STRUCTURE AND NEW HYBRID SILICATES AND METAL-SILICATES[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE SILICATES HYBRIDES ORGANIQUES-INORGANIQUES ET DE SILICATES MÉTALLIQUES À STRUCTURE ORDONNÉE ET NOUVEAUX SILICATES HYBRIDES ET SILICATES MÉTALLIQUES[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
12.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IDA]WO2008017513  (ENI SPA [IT], et al) [ID] 15-17,21 * claims 1-66 * * examples 1-14 * * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 11 * [A] 1-14,18-20;
 [AD]  - BELLUSSI G ET AL, "Crystalline hybrid organic-inorganic alumino-silicates", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, vol. 113, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.MICROMESO.2007.11.024, ISSN 1387-1811, (20080801), pages 252 - 260, (20080221), XP022700178 [AD] 1,15-17,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2007.11.024
 [A]  - STEFANO ZANARDI ET AL, "On the crystal structure solution and characterization of ECS-2, a novel microporous hybrid organic-inorganic material", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS, ELSEVIER B.V, vol. 174, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0167-2991(08)80050-X, ISSN 0167-2991, (20080101), pages 965 - 968, (20081106), XP008120377 [A] 1,15-17,21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(08)80050-X
 [A]  - DIAZ-MORALES U ET AL, "Ethane-silica hybrid material with ordered hexagonal mesoporous structure", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.MICROMESO.2005.08.004, ISSN 1387-1811, (20060109), pages 185 - 191, (20060109), XP028038628 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2005.08.004
 [A]  - INAGAKI S ET AL, "Novel Mesoporous Materials with a Uniform Distribution of Organic Groups and Inorganic Oxide in Their Frameworks", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS, US, (19991004), vol. 121, doi:10.1021/JA9916658, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9611 - 9614, XP002465124 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9916658
by applicantWO2008017513
    - A. CORMA; M. IGLESIAS; C. DEL PINO; F. SANCHEZ, J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1991), page 1253
    - F. SANCHEZ, M. IGLESIAS; A. CORMA; C. DEL PINO, J. MOL. CATAL., (1991), vol. 70, page 369
    - A. CARMONA; A. CORMA; M. IGLESIAS; A. SAN JOSE; F. SANCHEZ, J. ORGANOMETAL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 492, page 11
    - C.W. JONES; K. TSUJI; M.E. DAVIS, NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, page 52
    - C.W. JONES; K. TSUJI; M.E. DAVIS, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER., (1999), vol. 29, page 339
    - C.W. JONES; K. TSUJI; M.E. DAVIS, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER., (1999), vol. 33, page 223
    - C.W. JONES; K. TSUJI; M.E. DAVIS, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER., (2001), vol. 42, page 21
    - K. YAMAMOTO; Y. NOHARA; Y. DOMON; Y. TAKAHASHI; Y. SAKATA; J. 216VERT; T. TATSUMI, CHEM. MATER., (2005), vol. 17, page 3913
    - K. YAMAMOTO; T. TATSUMI, CHEM. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, page 972
    - U. DIAZ; J.A. VIDAL-MOYA; A. CORMA, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER., (2006), vol. 93, page 180
    - B.L. SU; M. ROUSSEL; K. VAUSE; X.Y. YANG; F. GILLES; L. SHI; E. LEONOVA; M. EDEN; X. ZOU, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER, (2007), vol. 105, page 49
    - S. INAGAKI; S. GUAN; T. OHSUNA; 0. TERASAKI, NATURE, (2002), vol. 416, page 304
    - G. BELLUSSI; A. CARATI; E. DI PAOLA; R. MILLINI; W.O. PARKER JR.; C. RIZZO; S. ZANARDI, MICROPOROUS MESOPOROUS MATER, (2008), vol. 113, page 252
    - G. ENGELHARDT; D. MICHEL, High-Resolution Solid-State NMR of Silicates and Zeolites, WILEY, (1987), pages 148 - 149
    - S. INAGAKI; S. GUAN; T. OHSUNA; O. TERASAKI, NATURE, (20020321), vol. 416, page 304