Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774111

EP2774111 - COMPUTER-AIDED TRAINING SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Furuno Electric Co., Ltd.
9-52, Ashihara-cho
Nishinomiya-City, Hyogo 662-8580 / JP
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Ken, Helle
Hammerholmen 44-48
DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK
02 / SORENSEN, Mads, Friis
Hammerholmen 44-48
DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12816113.002.11.2012
WO2012IB02732
Priority number, dateUS201161555909P04.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161555909 P
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013064903
Date:10.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2774111
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/20, G09B7/02
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:COMPUTERGESTÜTZTE SCHULUNGSSYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN[2014/37]
English:COMPUTER-AIDED TRAINING SYSTEMS, METHODS AND APPARATUSES[2014/37]
French:SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS D'APPRENTISSAGE ASSISTÉ PAR ORDINATEUR[2014/37]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
11.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
02.03.2015Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
20.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.08.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.10.2016Appeal received No.  T0500/17
13.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[I]US2006106941  (SINGHAL PRAVIN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-146 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1383065  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-146 * paragraph [0011] *