Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798137

EP2798137 - SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE, STORAGE COMPARTMENT WITH SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATION-ACTIVATED LOCKING OF A STORAGE COMPARTMENT RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flex Automotive GmbH
Arthur-B.-Modine-Straße 1
70794 Filderstadt / DE
[2018/35]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Flextronics Automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Benzstr. 2
72636 Frickenhausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNITZER, Jürgen, Michael
Limpurger Strasse 11
74405 Gaildorf / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12816303.727.12.2012
WO2012EP76950
Priority number, dateDE2011109001928.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011090019
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098323
Date:04.07.2013
Language:DE
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798137
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05B77/06
[2018/31]
Former International [2014/45]E05B65/12, B60R7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:ENTRIEGELUNGSSPERRVORRICHTUNG, AUFBEWAHRUNGSFACH MIT ENTRIEGELUNGSSPERRVORRICHTUNG, UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHLEUNIGUNGSAKTIVIERTEN SPERREN EINER ENTRIEGELUNG EINES AUFBEWAHRUNGSFACHES[2014/45]
English:SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE, STORAGE COMPARTMENT WITH SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATION-ACTIVATED LOCKING OF A STORAGE COMPARTMENT RELEASE[2014/45]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE DÉVERROUILLAGE, COMPARTIMENT DE STOCKAGE POURVU D'UN DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE DÉVERROUILLAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE BLOCAGE D'UN DÉVERROUILLAGE D'UN COMPARTIMENT DE STOCKAGE ACTIVÉ PAR ACCÉLÉRATION[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
13.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/25]
04.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017
31.12.201706   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2006261603  (CETNAR ROMAN [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [XA]US2007085349  (MERIDETH MARCUS [US] ET AL) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [XA]US2006237973  (ANGUILA ROMAIN [US]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [XA]DE202009009060U  (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [XA]EP1052354  (VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [AD]DE4427768  (SIDLER GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 2 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4427768