EP2798137 - SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE, STORAGE COMPARTMENT WITH SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATION-ACTIVATED LOCKING OF A STORAGE COMPARTMENT RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flex Automotive GmbH Arthur-B.-Modine-Straße 1 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Flextronics Automotive GmbH & Co. KG Benzstr. 2 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNITZER, Jürgen, Michael Limpurger Strasse 11 74405 Gaildorf / DE | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12816303.7 | 27.12.2012 | WO2012EP76950 | Priority number, date | DE20111090019 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011090019 | [2014/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013098323 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2798137 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05B77/06 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
E05B77/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | E05B65/12, B60R7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Title | German: | ENTRIEGELUNGSSPERRVORRICHTUNG, AUFBEWAHRUNGSFACH MIT ENTRIEGELUNGSSPERRVORRICHTUNG, UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHLEUNIGUNGSAKTIVIERTEN SPERREN EINER ENTRIEGELUNG EINES AUFBEWAHRUNGSFACHES | [2014/45] | English: | SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE, STORAGE COMPARTMENT WITH SAFETY LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATION-ACTIVATED LOCKING OF A STORAGE COMPARTMENT RELEASE | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE DÉVERROUILLAGE, COMPARTIMENT DE STOCKAGE POURVU D'UN DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DE DÉVERROUILLAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE BLOCAGE D'UN DÉVERROUILLAGE D'UN COMPARTIMENT DE STOCKAGE ACTIVÉ PAR ACCÉLÉRATION | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 13.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 31.12.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2006261603 (CETNAR ROMAN [CA], et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]US2007085349 (MERIDETH MARCUS [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]US2006237973 (ANGUILA ROMAIN [US]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]DE202009009060U (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XA]EP1052354 (VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [AD]DE4427768 (SIDLER GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 2 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4427768 |