Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791067

EP2791067 - OXIDATION METHOD, NOZZLE AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Strunk, Sven
Oberdorfstrasse 15
9642 Ebnat-Kappel / CH
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Strunk, Sven
Berglistrasse 21
9642 Ebnat-Kappel / CH
 [2019/07]
Former [2017/30]01 / Strunk, Sven
Oberdorfstrasse 15
9642 Ebnat-Kappel / CH
Former [2014/43]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12816455.514.12.2012
[2019/07]
WO2012EP05172
Priority number, dateDE20111012119316.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011121193
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087219
Date:20.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791067
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2791067
Date:13.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/72, B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B01F5/04
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OXIDATIONSVERFAHREN, DÜSE UND ANLAGE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABWÄSSERN[2014/43]
English:OXIDATION METHOD, NOZZLE AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING WASTE WATER[2014/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OXYDATION, BUSE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT D'EAUX USÉES[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
27.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2018Fee for grant paid
21.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201706   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES13.02.2019
FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
IT13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/46]FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
IT13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.02.2019
HR13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
LV13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
RS13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
IS13.06.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
BG13.05.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
GR14.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NL13.02.2019
SE13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.02.2019
LT13.02.2019
NO13.05.2019
PT13.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[IA]US4809911  (RYAN JOHN [US]) [I] 1-4,8-10,12 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 50; figures 2,7 * [A] 5-7,11;
 [A]US6237897  (MARINA ANTONIO [VE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4446375  (IVET INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT FUE [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4314521
 WO9857895
    - N. M. EMANUEL; Z. K. MAIZUS; I. P. SKIBIDA, ANGEW. CHEM., (1969), vol. 81, pages 91 - 101
    - H. R. KLÄY, SULZER TECHNICAL REVIEW, (1988), vol. 4, pages 41 - 43
    - K. HOLZER, UMWELT, (1991), vol. 21, pages 179 - 181
    - F. HABER; J. WEISS, PROC. ROY. SOC. (LONDON, (1934), vol. A 147, pages 332 - 351
    - U. SEWEKOW, MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, (1993), pages 153 - 157
    - W. FEUERSTEIN ET AL., VOM WASSER, (1981), vol. 56, pages 35 - 54