Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805421

EP2805421 - RADIO FREQUENCY DIGITAL FILTER GROUP DELAY MISMATCH REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WYVILLE, Mark
2061 Lenester Ave
Otawa K2A 1K6 / CA
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12816516.406.12.2012
WO2012IB57045
Priority number, dateUS20121335100816.01.2012         Original published format: US201213351008
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108096
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805421
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/04, H03F1/32, H04B1/18, H04B1/00, H04W88/10
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG VON VERZÖGERUNGSDISKREPANZEN IN EINER DIGITALEN FUNKFREQUENZFILTERGRUPPE[2014/48]
English:RADIO FREQUENCY DIGITAL FILTER GROUP DELAY MISMATCH REDUCTION[2014/48]
French:RÉDUCTION DE DÉFAUT DE CONCORDANCE DE RETARD DE GROUPE POUR DES FILTRES NUMÉRIQUES RADIOFRÉQUENCE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/04]
03.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4450417  (FOLKMANN ANDREW F [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-9,11-20 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 16 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 20 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 57 * * figures 1,3,6-8 *;
 [Y]EP2259250  (NXP BV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,6-9,11-20 * paragraphs [0087] - [0096]; figure 11 *;
 [Y]EP1921603  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-9,11-20 * paragraphs [0082] - [0088]; figures 11A, 11B *;
 [Y]US2005127996  (JELONNEK BJORN [DE] ET AL JELONNEK BJOERN [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-3,6-9,11-20 * figure 2 *