Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793740

EP2793740 - POWER TOOTHBRUSH WITH MOVING PADDLE MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]BRUSHHEAD FOR A POWER TOOTHBRUSH WITH MOVING PADDLE MEMBERS
[2017/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/09]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KLOSTER, Tyler G.
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Coops, Peter
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/09]
Former [2014/44]Coops, Peter
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date12816523.011.12.2012
[2018/09]
WO2012IB57165
Priority number, dateUS201161578961P22.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578961 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093709
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793740
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793740
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/22, A61C17/34
[2017/37]
Former International [2014/44]A61C17/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT BEWEGLICHEN PADDELELEMENTEN[2017/37]
English:POWER TOOTHBRUSH WITH MOVING PADDLE MEMBERS[2017/37]
French:BROSSE À DENTS ÉLECTRIQUE AYANT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE PALETTE MOBILES[2017/37]
Former [2014/44]BÜRSTENKOPF FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT BEWEGLICHEN PADDELELEMENTEN
Former [2014/44]BRUSHHEAD FOR A POWER TOOTHBRUSH WITH MOVING PADDLE MEMBERS
Former [2014/44]TÊTE DE BROSSE POUR UNE BROSSE À DENTS ÉLECTRIQUE AYANT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE PALETTE MOBILES
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
26.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2018Fee for grant paid
15.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2017
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
IT28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2009148439  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]; KEMP JAMES [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0032] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 2,3,6;
 [X]DE202005011363U  (TRISA HOLDING AG TRIENGEN [CH]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0067] * * figures 6,10 *;
 [X]US5842249  (SATO MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1,7 * figure 18 * * column 1, paragraph 1 *