Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795871

EP2795871 - IP ADDRESS DISCOVERY FOR TDLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / RAJAMANI, Krishnan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / WENTINK, Maarten Menzo
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date12816574.320.12.2012
WO2012US71061
Priority number, dateUS20111333424022.12.2011         Original published format: US201113334240
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013096678
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2795871
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W76/02
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:IP-ADRESSENERKENNUNG FÜR TDLS[2014/44]
English:IP ADDRESS DISCOVERY FOR TDLS[2014/44]
French:DÉCOUVERTE D'ADRESSE IP POUR TDLS[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2014National basic fee paid 
06.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
20.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/31]
27.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010044533  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-61 * paragraphs [0036] , [0042] *;
 [X]US2011082939  (MONTEMURRO MICHAEL PETER [CA], et al) [X] 1-61 * paragraphs [0061] , [0068] *;
 [A]US2011103264  (WENTINK MAARTEN MENZO [NL]) [A] 1-61 * paragraph [0078] *
 [X]  - MICHAEL MONTEMURRO ET AL, "IEEE 802.11 Wireless LANs TDLS Peer Discovery", INTERNET CITATION, (20100118), pages 1 - 13, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/09/11-09-1218-07-000z-tdls-peer-discovery.doc, (20110804), XP002656379 [X] 1-61 * section U.1a.1 *