Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783369

EP2783369 - THERMAL-ENERGY PRODUCING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Soininen, Pekka
Haltijatontuntie 21 A1
02200 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2017/48]For all designated states
Soininen, Pekka
Haltijatontunie 21 A1
02200 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Etiam Oy
Kuntokatu 3
15900 Lahti / FI
Inventor(s)01 / SOININEN, Pekka
c/o Etiam Oy
Tietotie 3
FI-02150 Espoo / FI
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date12816683.227.11.2012
[2017/24]
WO2012FI51171
Priority number, dateUS201161563786P27.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563786 P
US201261669077P08.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261669077 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013076378
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783369
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783369
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRODUKTION VON WÄRMEENERGIE[2014/40]
English:THERMAL-ENERGY PRODUCING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2014/40]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.12.2016Fee for grant paid
05.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.08.2016
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE27.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE27.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
LU27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010058288  (PIANTELLI SILVIA, et al) [X] 1-2,4-6,8,11-14,27-33 * the whole document * [I] 3,10,35-36;
 [A]WO9520816  (FOCARDI SERGIO [IT], et al) [A] 1,8,29,35 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 6 *;
 [A]WO2009125444  (PASCUCCI MADDALENA [IT], et al) [A] 1,29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BADIEI S ET AL, "Rydberg Matter of K and N2: angular dependence of the time-of-flight for neutral and ionized clusters formed in Coulomb explosions", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MASS SPECTROMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021001), vol. 220, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1387-3806(02)00689-9, ISSN 1387-3806, pages 127 - 136, XP004380684 [A] 12-23 * page 127, paragraph 1 - page 128, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1387-3806(02)00689-9
by applicant   - JEFFREY A. GEUTHERA; YARON DANON, "Electron and positive ion acceleration with pyroelectric crystals", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS 97, (1997), page 074109 S2005D,
    - W. HU ET AL., "present piezoelectric materials made from ternary solid solutions of BiFe03-PbZr03-PbTi03", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (201105), vol. 31, no. 5, pages 801 - 807,
    - P. SHIV HALASYAMANI; KENNETH R., "Poeppelmeier have compiled and categorized over 500 noncentrosymmetric oxides by symmetry-dependent property and crystal class", CHEM. MATER, (1998), vol. 10, pages 2753 - 2769,
    - Transition metal hydrides, JOHN WILEY & SONS,
    - "Hydrides: Solid State Transition Metal Complexes", KLAUS YVON; GUILLAUME RENAUDIN, Encyclopedia of Inorganic Chemistry, vol. III, pages 1814 - 1846,
    - S. S. BATSANOV; V. 1. GALKO; K. V. PAPUGIN, "Dielectric permittivity and electrical conductivity of polycrystalline materials", INORGANIC MATERIALS, (2010), vol. 46, no. 12, pages 1365 - 1368,
    - B. NARANJO; J.K. GIMZEWSKI; S. PUTTERMAN, "a pyroelectric crystal", NATURE, (20050428), vol. 434, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03575, pages 1115 - 1117, XP002447222

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03575
    - K. YVON, "Hydrogen in novel solid-state metal hydrides", Z. KRISTALLOGR, (2003), vol. 218, pages 108 - 116,
    - BARANOWSKI; S.M. FILIPEK, POLISH J. CHEM, (2005), vol. 79, pages 789 - 806,
    - NUALA P. FITZSIMONS, CATALYSIS LETTERS, (1992), vol. 15, pages 83 - 94,
    - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 17,
    - "Catalyst, Supported", DUNCAN J. MACQUARRIE; MARIO DE BRUYN, Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, WILEY,
    - "Heterogeneous Catalysis and Solid Catalysts", HELMUT KN6ZINGER; KARL KOCHLOEFL; THOMAS TUREK, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, WILEY-VCH VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA,
    - "Refining and Petrochemicals", CARLO GIAVARINI; FERRUCCIO TRIFIRO, Encyclopaedia of Hydrocarbons, ISTITUTO DELLA ENCICLOPEDIA, vol. II,
    - D.C. PUXLEY; I.J. KITCHENER; C. KOMODROMOS; N.D. PARKYNS, "The Effect Of Preparation Method Upon The Structures, Stability And Metal/Support Interactions In Nickel/Alumina Catalysts", SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 16, pages 237 - 271,
    - "Indirect, Reversible High-Density Hydrogen Storage in Compact Metal Ammine Salts", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, pages 8660 - 8668,
    - "Rydberg Atoms", THOMAS F. GALLAGHER, Cambridge Monographs on Atomic, Molecular and Chemical Physics, UNIVERSITY PRESS,
    - JIAXI WANG; LEIFHOLMLID, "Formation of long-lived Rydberg states of H2 at K impregnated surfaces", CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (2000), vol. 261, pages 481 - 488,
    - L. HOLMLID; H. HORA; G. MILEY; X. YANG, "Ultrahigh-density deuterium of Rydberg matter clusters for inertial confinement fusion targets", LASER AND PARTICLE BEAMS, (2009), vol. 27, pages 529 - 532,
    - SHAHRIAR BADIEI; PATRIC U; ANDERSSON; LEIFHOLMLID, "Fusion reactions in high-density hydrogen: A fast route to small-scale fusion", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (2009), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijhydene.2008.10.024, pages 487 - 495, XP025840944

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2008.10.024
    - Modern Aspects of Electrochemistry 44, Modeling and Simulations II, SPRINGER, vol. 2, pages 70 - 73,