Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798583

EP2798583 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A CARD OF SMALL THICKNESS DETACHABLE FROM A PLATE OF LARGE THICKNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oberthur Technologies
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BOSQUET, Olivier
32 rue Emilia Lebreton
F-35500 Vitre / FR
02 / SIMONEAUX, Grégory
3 rue Théodore Botrel
F-35530 Servon sur Vilaine / FR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[2017/18]
Former [2014/45]Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12816775.621.12.2012
[2017/18]
WO2012FR53057
Priority number, dateFR2011006252229.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162522
[2014/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098518
Date:04.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798583
Date:05.11.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798583
Date:03.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VON EINER DICKEN PLATTE LÖSBAREN DÜNNEN KARTE[2014/45]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A CARD OF SMALL THICKNESS DETACHABLE FROM A PLATE OF LARGE THICKNESS[2014/45]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE DE PETITE EPAISSEUR DETACHABLE D'UNE PLAQUE DE GRANDE EPAISSEUR[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
26.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2017Fee for grant paid
27.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2016
Opposition(s)06.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2012
AT03.05.2017
CY03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
GB21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU21.12.2012
AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
GB21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MC03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
GB21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
GB21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
GB21.12.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
IE21.12.2017
LU21.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
MT03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
LU21.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SI03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
IT03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
SM03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT03.05.2017
CZ03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RO03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
SK03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT03.05.2017
DK03.05.2017
EE03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
NL03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
LV03.05.2017
PL03.05.2017
RS03.05.2017
SE03.05.2017
BG03.08.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT03.05.2017
ES03.05.2017
FI03.05.2017
HR03.05.2017
LT03.05.2017
NO03.08.2017
GR04.08.2017
IS03.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO02066226  (TELE CD COMPANY AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,8-12;
 [A]DE19906570  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 26 - line 67; figure - *