Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795684

EP2795684 - METHODS FOR ANNEALING SEMICONDCUTOR WINDOW LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
First Solar Malaysia SDN.BHD
No 8, Jalan Hi-Tech 3/3
Zon Industri Fasa 3
Kulim Hi-Tech Park, 09000
Kulim
Kedah Darul Aman / MY
[2018/07]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
First Solar Malaysia SDN.BHD
No 8, Jalan Hi-Tech 3/3
Zon Industri Fasa 3
Kulim Hi-Tech Park, 09000
Kulim
Kedah Darul Aman / MY
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Jinbo
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
02 / ROJO, Juan, Carlos
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
03 / DALAKOS, George, Theodore
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
04 / YAKIMOV, Aharon
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
05 / ZHONG, Dalong
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
06 / KOREVAAR, Bastiaan, Arie
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
07 / FELDMAN-PEABODY, Scott, D.
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Thurston, Joanna , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12818701.014.12.2012
[2018/07]
WO2012US69660
Priority number, dateUS20111332941819.12.2011         Original published format: US201113329418
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013096105
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795684
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795684
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/477, H01L31/18, H01L31/0392
[2017/33]
Former International [2014/44]H01L31/18, H01L21/477
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM GLÜHEN VON HALBLEITERFENSTERSCHICHTEN[2014/44]
English:METHODS FOR ANNEALING SEMICONDCUTOR WINDOW LAYERS[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE RECUIT DE COUCHES FENÊTRES POUR SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2017/33]
Former [2014/44]PROCÉDÉS DE RECUISSON DE COUCHES FENÊTRES POUR SEMI-CONDUCTEURS
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2017Fee for grant paid
03.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2016
Opposition(s)15.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0174010  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,13-18 * page 2, line 3 * * abstract *;
 [Y]US4830987  (MILLER DENISE L [US] ET AL) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 60 *;
 [A]US4708883  (HOVEL HAROLD J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3,6,7,9 * column 5, lines 9-13; figure 3 *;
 [XY]  - ARMIENTO C A ET AL, "CAPLESS RAPID THERMAL ANNEALING OF GAAS IMPLANTED WITH SI USING AN ENHANCED OVERPRESSURE PROXIMITY METHOD", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE; US, (19870801), vol. 134, no. 8A, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 2010 - 2016, XP000840329 [X] 1,3,4,6,13,18,19,22 * page 2011, column r; figures 2,3 * [Y] 5,20,21,23-27
 [X]  - PANDE K P ET AL, "A SIMPLIFIED CAPLESS ANNEALING OF GAAS FOR MESFET APPLICATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (19840401), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 506 - 508, XP000836708 [X] 1,2,13,18,22 * page 506 *
 [Y]  - SCHINK H ET AL, "Sub-micron self-aligned-gate HEMT for microwave applications", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 34, no. 11, doi:10.1016/0038-1101(91)90064-6, ISSN 0038-1101, (19911101), pages 1247 - 1250, (19911101), XP025755218 [Y] 1,2,13-18 * figure 1; table I *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0038-1101(91)90064-6
 [Y]  - SETH A ET AL, "Growth and characterization of CdTe by close spaced sublimation on metal substrates", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990901), vol. 59, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0927-0248(99)00029-X, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 35 - 49, XP004181614 [Y] 20,21,23-26 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(99)00029-X
 [Y]  - WU X, "High-efficiency polycrystalline CdTe thin-film solar cells", SOLAR ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS. OXFORD, GB, (20041201), vol. 77, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.SOLENER.2004.06.006, ISSN 0038-092X, pages 803 - 814, XP004661821 [Y] 27 * page 807, column r *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solener.2004.06.006
 [A]  - WONG D ET AL, "Reduction of bulk and surface recombination in GaAs for improved solar cell performance", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19900701), vol. 11, no. 7, doi:10.1109/55.56488, ISSN 0741-3106, pages 321 - 323, XP011405959 [A] 1,2 * first sentence of paragraph II; page 321 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/55.56488
 [A]  - WONG D ET AL, "DEFECT SUPPRESSION AND ENHANCEMENT OF MINORITY CARRIER LIFETIMES INBULK GAAS", SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA.S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19891001), vol. 27, no. 1 - 04, doi:10.1016/0379-6787(89)90051-3, pages 419 - 427, XP000086796 [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0002] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0379-6787(89)90051-3
 [A]  - WU X ET AL, "High-efficiency polycrystalline CdTe thin-film solar cells with an oxygenated amorphous cds (a-CdS:O) window layer", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 2002 INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS INC. US; [IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 29TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE - 200, (20020519), vol. CONF. 29, doi:10.1109/PVSC.2002.1190619, ISBN 978-0-7803-7471-3, pages 531 - 534, XP010666361 [A] 1,23-27 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2002.1190619
 [XP]  - GHOSH T ET AL, "Controlling the electrical property of highly transparent conducting film of Zn coated Al doped ZnO by mechano-chemical pathway of face-to-face annealing", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 528, doi:10.1016/J.CPLETT.2012.01.029, ISSN 0009-2614, (20120112), pages 68 - 71, (20120120), XP028458673 [XP] 1,2,13,14,18,20,21,23 * paragraph [0002] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2012.01.029