Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795684 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795684



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 318
19.12.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
03.11.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
27.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
15.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
15.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.10.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 46
31.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
04.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
04.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
22.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
04.01.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.01.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 5
04.01.2013 Description International Searching Authority 18
04.01.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
04.01.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 6