Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2795684 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280070113 EP12818701



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104115289BGlobal Dossier 26.10.2016B
CN104115289 22.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US69660 14.12.2012
US201113329418 19.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2795684Global Dossier 14.02.2018B1
EP2795684 29.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US69660 14.12.2012
US201113329418 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013096105Global Dossier 27.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113329418 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9147582Global Dossier 29.09.2015B2
US2013157405 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113329418 19.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY166589 17.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201113329418 19.12.2011