Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798581

EP2798581 - RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION TAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2016/49]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
World Shaving Headquarters
One Gillette Park
Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STRIEMER, Grant, Edward
1653 Eden Park Drive 9
Cincinnati, Ohio 45013 / US
02 / AMANN, Mathias
Amselweg 35
64295 Darmstadt Hessen / DE
03 / JOYCE, Jonathan, Livingston
1063 Ivoryhill Drive
Independence, Kentucky 41051 / US
04 / SHERMAN, Faiz, Feisal
5358 Crimson Glory Place
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
05 / BOURILKOV, Jordan, Todorov
102 High Road
Bethany, Connecticut 06524 / US
06 / MORROW, Mark, Wayne
5178 Sugar Camp Road
Milford, Ohio 45150 / US
07 / DE CASTRO, Jose Tadeo, Vergara
943 Commonwealth Avenue
Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US
08 / MESCHKAT, Stephan, James Andreas
Sandwiese 19
65812 Bad Soden / DE
09 / FRANKE, Michael
Dahlienweg 23
64291 Darmstadt / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Zetterer, Gerd
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zetterer, Gerd
P&G Manufacturing GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date12818853.920.12.2012
WO2012US70912
Priority number, dateUS201161580379P27.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161580379 P
US20121361642814.09.2012         Original published format: US201213616428
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101654
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798581
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, G06K19/077
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:RFID-ETIKETT[2014/45]
English:RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION TAG[2014/45]
French:ETIQUETTE D'IDENTIFICATION RADIOFRÉQUENCE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014National basic fee paid 
03.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/15]
04.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6215401  (BRADY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,6,10,13-15;
 [XY]US5786626  (BRADY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11,12 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 67; figure 2c * [Y] 6,10,13-15;
 [XY]DE102007028467  (POLYIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0047] , [0060] , [0061] , [0069] * [Y] 10;
 [X]US7049962  (ATHERTON PETER S [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9,11 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 55; figure 7 *;
 [Y]US2009315720  (CLEMENT JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,13-15 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0050] , [0069] , [0072] , [0074]; figures 6,8 *;
 [Y]US2004070510  (ZHANG YIMIN [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE102009005100  (SCHREINER GROUP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0042] , [0059] , [0060]; figure 4 *;
 [Y]FR2828953  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 7, line 20 - line 25; figures 1e,3 *