Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798306

EP2798306 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING HEADING INFORMATION IN A TERMINAL, AND ASSOCIATED TERMINAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THALES
45, rue de Villiers
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Thales
45, rue de Villiers
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / FRANCHETEAU, Anthony
110 avenue Leclerc
BP 70945
F-49309 Cholet / FR
02 / GUILBOT, Paul
110 avenue Leclerc
BP 70945
F-49309 Cholet / FR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12818895.027.12.2012
WO2012EP76988
Priority number, dateFR2011000411927.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1104119
[2014/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098351
Date:04.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798306
Date:05.11.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/20
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON RICHTUNGSKURSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM ENDGERÄT, ENTSPRECHENDES ENDGERÄT UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM[2014/45]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING HEADING INFORMATION IN A TERMINAL, AND ASSOCIATED TERMINAL AND COMPUTER PROGRAM[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CAP DANS UN TERMINAL, TERMINAL ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
17.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/32]
20.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - PRIYANKA AGGARWAL ET AL, "Map matching and heuristic elimination of gyro drift for personal navigation systems in GPS-denied conditions", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20110201), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/22/2/025205, ISSN 0957-0233, page 25205, XP020186631 [X] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13,16,17 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,6,7,10,11,14,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/22/2/025205
 [XI]  - JIMENEZ A R ET AL, "Improved Heuristic Drift Elimination (iHDE) for pedestrian navigation in complex buildings", INDOOR POSITIONING AND INDOOR NAVIGATION (IPIN), 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110921), doi:10.1109/IPIN.2011.6071923, ISBN 978-1-4577-1805-2, pages 1 - 8, XP031990138 [X] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13,16,17 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,6,7,10,11,14,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPIN.2011.6071923
 [A]  - JO AGILA BITSCH LINK ET AL, "FootPath: Accurate map-based indoor navigation using smartphones", INDOOR POSITIONING AND INDOOR NAVIGATION (IPIN), 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110921), doi:10.1109/IPIN.2011.6071934, ISBN 978-1-4577-1805-2, pages 1 - 8, XP031990149 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPIN.2011.6071934
 [A]  - IONUT CONSTANDACHE ET AL, "Towards Mobile Phone Localization without War-Driving", INFOCOM, 2010 PROCEEDINGS IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100314), ISBN 978-1-4244-5836-3, pages 1 - 9, XP031674945 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *