Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798419

EP2798419 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR LOCATING AND NOTIFYING FAULT AND HANDLING ALARM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Change - prioritypublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / GHOSH, Sanjay
202 Sreedevi Classic Appartments
4th Cross Anugraha Layout
B. Narayanpura
Bangalore 560016 / IN
02 / R, Srikanth
B306 Purva Belmont
Kanakapura Road
JP Nagar 6th Phase
Bangalore 560078 / IN
03 / FULLER, Ivan, Bernard
Flat LG
Block 3 Sanskruti
27 Santhanalakshmi Street
Rajeswari Nagar
Selaiyur Tamil Nadu Chennai 600073 / IN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12818916.419.12.2012
WO2012IB02745
Priority number, dateIN2011CHE455826.12.2011         Original published format: IN 4558CH2011
[2017/16]
Former [2014/45]IN2011CHE455826.12.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098619
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798419
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418, G06Q10/00, G05B23/02
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALISIERUNG UND MELDUNG VON STÖRUNGEN UND ZUR HANDHABUNG DER ENTSPRECHENDEN ALARME[2014/45]
English:A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR LOCATING AND NOTIFYING FAULT AND HANDLING ALARM THEREOF[2014/45]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION ET DE NOTIFICATION DE DÉFAUT ET D'ALARME DE MANIPULATION ASSOCIÉE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2014National basic fee paid 
16.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]US2002163427  (ERYUREK EVREN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1,7,8 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0093] *;
 [A]EP1906289  (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0046] *;
 [A]US2004172147  (DILLON STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1,4-6 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0074] *;
 [A]US2004204775  (KEYES MARION A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0087] *