Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795580 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795580



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 250
05.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.11.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.11.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
05.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
20.11.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.10.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
23.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.10.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
11.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
11.06.2018 Description Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.12.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
13.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
16.05.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
21.12.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.12.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 4
21.12.2012 Description International Searching Authority 15
21.12.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 4