Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795580


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 (Expected) grant published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
08.11.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.04.2019 Change - classification published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
19.04.2019 Change - classification published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
05.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
13.06.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.02.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.05.2016 First examination report
09.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
30.01.2015 Change - inventor published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
14.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication