Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2795580

Designated contracting statesAL 
 AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MK 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 RS 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 SM 
 TR 
Examination procedure05.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted18.12.2019
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:29.10.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140613
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:BENOSMAN, RYAD
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:IENG, SIOHOI
 
Event date:01.04.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160530
 
Event date:19.12.2018 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:SORBONNE UNIVERSITE
 
Event date:19.12.2018 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (C.N.
 
Event date:22.05.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06T 7/20 20170101AFI20190415BHEP
 
Event date:22.05.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G06T 7/269 20170101ALI20190415BHEP
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190705