Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795580

EP2795580 - METHOD OF ESTIMATING OPTICAL FLOW ON THE BASIS OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS LIGHT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sorbonne Université
21, rue de l'Ecole de Médecine
75006 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2018/51]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6)
4, Place Jussieu
75005 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BENOSMAN, Ryad
5 Boulevard Exelmans
F-75016 Paris / FR
02 / IENG, Siohoi
28 rue Garibaldi
F-93100 Montreuil / FR
 [2015/10]
Former [2014/44]01 / BENOSMAN, Ryad
5 Boulevard Exelmans
F-75016 Paris / FR
02 / IENG, Siohoi
40 rue de la Butte aux Cailles
F-75013 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/51]
Former [2014/44]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date12819105.321.12.2012
[2019/51]
WO2012FR53066
Priority number, dateFR2011006213721.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162137
[2014/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093378
Date:27.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795580
Date:29.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2795580
Date:18.12.2019
Language:FR
[2019/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/20, G06T7/269
[2019/21]
Former International [2014/44]G06T7/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES OPTISCHEN FLUSSES AUF BASIS EINES ASYNCHRONEN LICHTSENSORS[2014/44]
English:METHOD OF ESTIMATING OPTICAL FLOW ON THE BASIS OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS LIGHT SENSOR[2014/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE FLOT OPTIQUE À PARTIR D'UN CAPTEUR ASYNCHRONE DE LUMIÈRE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
30.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2019Fee for grant paid
05.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAI]  - RYAD BENOSMAN ET AL, "Asynchronous frameless event-based optical flow", NEURAL NETWORKS, (20111125), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/j.neunet.2011.11.001, ISSN 0893-6080, pages 32 - 37, XP055035741 [X] 1-4,7-12,14 * abstract * * page 33 - page 35 * [A] 6 [I] 5,13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neunet.2011.11.001
 [A]  - CHIARA BARTOLOZZI ET AL, "Attentive motion sensor for mobile robotic applications", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110515), doi:10.1109/ISCAS.2011.5938190, ISBN 978-1-4244-9473-6, pages 2813 - 2816, XP032109722 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2011.5938190
 [AD]  - TOBI DELBRUCK, "Frame-free dynamic digital vision", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURE-LIFE ELECTRONICS, ADVANCED ELECTRONICS FOR QUALITY LIFE AND SOCIETY, University of Tokyo, (20080307), pages 21 - 26, XP055035734 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - PATRICK LICHTSTEINER ET AL, "A 128128 120 dB 15 s Latency Asynchronous Temporal Contrast Vision Sensor", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080201), vol. 43, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2007.914337, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 566 - 576, XP011200748 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2007.914337
 [A]  - BENOSMAN R ET AL, "Asynchronous Event-Based Hebbian Epipolar Geometry", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20111101), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TNN.2011.2167239, ISSN 1045-9227, pages 1723 - 1734, XP011411486 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNN.2011.2167239
by applicantUS2008135731
    - J.L. BARRON ET AL., "Performance of Optical Flow Techniques", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, vol. 12, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/BF01420984, pages 43 - 77, XP001109171

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01420984
    - T. DELBRÜCK ET AL., "Activity-Driven, Event-Based Vision Sensors", PROCEEDINGS OF 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS, pages 2426 - 2429
    - "Frame-free dynamic digital vision", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURE-LIFE ELECTRONICS, (20080306), pages 21 - 26
    - R. BENOSMAN, "Asynchronous frameless event-based optical flow", NEURAL NETWORKS, (201203), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neunet.2011.11.001, pages 32 - 37, XP055035741

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neunet.2011.11.001
    - P. LICHTSTEINER ET AL., "A 128x128 120 dB 15 µs Latency Asynchronous Temporal Contrast Vision Sensor", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (200802), vol. 43, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/JSSC.2007.914337, pages 566 - 576, XP011200748

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2007.914337