Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798668

EP2798668 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTILAYER STRUCTURE ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSSINI, Umberto
194 Bois Joli
F-38500 Coublevie / FR
02 / TEMPLIER, François
17 Rue des Martyrs
F-38054 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Thibon, Laurent
Cabinet Beaumont
4, Place Robert Schuman
B.P. 1529
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Thibon, Laurent
Cabinet Beaumont
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date12819117.827.12.2012
[2016/38]
WO2012FR53091
Priority number, dateFR2011006252329.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1162523
[2014/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098530
Date:04.07.2013
Language:FR
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798668
Date:05.11.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798668
Date:21.09.2016
Language:FR
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/16, H01L29/04, H01L23/00, H01L21/762, B32B17/06, H01L21/20
[2016/12]
Former International [2014/45]H01L21/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN STRUKTUR AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT[2014/45]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTILAYER STRUCTURE ON A SUBSTRATE[2014/45]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE MULTICOUCHE SUR UN SUPPORT[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/45]
30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
08.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/45]
06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.07.2016Fee for grant paid
08.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Request for further processing for:01.09.2014Request for further processing filed
01.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
CY, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CH, BG, BE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, AT, AL
30.07.2014Request for further processing filed
30.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
30.07.2014Request for further processing filed
30.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
30.07.2014Request for further processing filed
30.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.12.2012
AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
TR21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
GB27.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU27.12.2012
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
TR21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
GB27.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU27.12.2012
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
MT21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
GB27.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU27.12.2012
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
GB27.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
GB27.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/49]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IE27.12.2016
LU27.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
FR02.01.2017
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009072343  (OHNUMA HIDETO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0091]; figures 1A-1H * [I] 2-8,10-13;
 [X]EP2068358  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047]; figures 2c-2f *;
 [A]US2009061593  (GADKAREE KISHOR PURUSHOTTAM [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-7 *