Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787882

EP2787882 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPIC IMAGING VOLUME OF INTEREST POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ZAGORCHEV, Lyubomir Georgiev
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / YOUNG, Stewart
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date12819138.404.12.2012
WO2012IB56938
Priority number, dateUS201161568700P09.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568700 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084142
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787882
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/055, G01R33/483, G01R33/485, G01R33/54, G01R33/56
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:POSITIONIERUNG EINES BESTIMMTEN VOLUMENS IN DER MR-SPEKTROSKOPIE[2014/42]
English:MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPIC IMAGING VOLUME OF INTEREST POSITIONING[2014/42]
French:POSITIONNEMENT DE VOLUME D'INTÉRÊT POUR IMAGERIE SPECTROSCOPIQUE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
05.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2016Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
13.05.2016Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004218796  (RYNER LAWRENCE N [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-9,11,12,15-19 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; claims 1,4 * [I] 10,13,14,20;
 [XI]WO2011050348  (STC UNM [US]; POSSE STEFAN [US]; VAN DER KOUWE ANDRE [US]; GAO KUNXIU) [X] 1-8,11,12,15-19 * page 3, line 18 - page 14, line 18; claims 12-14 * * page 38, line 3 - line 18 * [I] 9,10,13,14,20;
 [XI]  - RAKESH SHARMA, "Molecular Imaging by Proton Magnetic Resonance Imaging (MRI) and MR Spectroscopic Imaging (MRSI) in Neurodegeneration", INFORMATICA MEDICA SLOVENICA, (20050630), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 35 - 55, XP055056876 [X] 1-8,10-20 * page 36, column 2 - page 39; figures 1,2,4,5 * * page 41, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 42, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 53 * [I] 9
 [XI]  - PARMESHWAR KHURD ET AL, Facilitating 3D Spectroscopic Imaging through Automatic Prostate Localization in MR Images Using Random Walker Segmentation Initialized via Boosted Classifiers, PROSTATE CANCER IMAGING. IMAGE ANALYSIS AND IMAGE-GUIDED INTERVENTIONS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 47 - 56, (20110922), ISBN 978-3-642-23943-4, XP019166350 [X] 1-9,11,12,15-19 * page 47 - page 48, paragraph 1 * * page 49, paragraph 2 - page 53, paragraph 2 * * page 54, paragraph 3 * [I] 10,13,14,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-23944-1_5
 [A]  - GRAEME F. MASON ET AL, "Evaluation of 31P metabolite differences in human cerebral gray and white matter", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (19980301), vol. 39, no. 3, doi:10.1002/mrm.1910390303, pages 346 - 353, XP055056879 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.1910390303
 [A]  - W WEBER-FAHR ET AL, "A Fully Automated Method for Tissue Segmentation and CSF-Correction of Proton MRSI Metabolites Corroborates Abnormal Hippocampal NAA in Schizophrenia", NEUROIMAGE, (20020501), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1006/nimg.2002.1057, ISSN 1053-8119, pages 49 - 60, XP055056883 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/nimg.2002.1057
 [A]  - GÃRAN STARCK ET AL, "A 1H magnetic resonance spectroscopy study in adults with obsessive compulsive disorder: relationship between metabolite concentrations and symptom severity", JOURNAL OF NEURAL TRANSMISSION ; BASIC NEUROSCIENCES, GENETICS AND IMMUNOLOGY, PARKINSON'S DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITIONS, ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY RELATED DISORDERS, BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, BIOLOGICAL CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIAT, (20080605), vol. 115, no. 7, ISSN 1435-1463, pages 1051 - 1062, XP019633952 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ULRIKE DYDAK ET AL, "In Vivo Measurement of Brain GABA Concentrations by Magnetic Resonance Spectroscopy in Smelters Occupationally Exposed to Manganese", ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PERSPECTIVES, (20100928), vol. 119, no. 2, doi:10.1289/ehp.1002192, ISSN 0091-6765, pages 219 - 224, XP055056933 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1289/ehp.1002192
 [AD]  - LYUBOMIR ZAGORCHEV ET AL, Manual Annotation, 3-D Shape Reconstruction, and Traumatic Brain Injury Analysis, MULTIMODAL BRAIN IMAGE ANALYSIS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 52 - 59, (20110918), ISBN 978-3-642-24445-2, XP019166793 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-24446-9_7
 [AD]  - LYUBOMIR ZAGORCHEV ET AL, Evaluation of Traumatic Brain Injury Patients Using a Shape-Constrained Deformable Model, MULTIMODAL BRAIN IMAGE ANALYSIS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 118 - 125, (20110918), ISBN 978-3-642-24445-2, XP019166782 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-24446-9_15