Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804985

EP2804985 - A DECAY PREVENTION PLATE AND ITS METHOD OF ASSEMBLING IN A CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE JONG, Jan Dave
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / OORSCHOT, Ronald Willem Arie
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12819149.118.12.2012
WO2012NL50899
Priority number, dateEP2011019434219.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11194342
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013095128
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804985
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:E01F15/04, E01D19/10, E04H17/14, E02B3/24, E02B3/28, E04B1/41
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:ZERFALLVERHINDERUNGSPLATTE UND DESSEN MONTAGEVERFAHREN IN EINEM BAUTEIL[2014/48]
English:A DECAY PREVENTION PLATE AND ITS METHOD OF ASSEMBLING IN A CONSTRUCTION[2014/48]
French:PLAQUE DE PRÉVENTION D'AFFAISSEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DANS UNE CONSTRUCTION[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
13.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[AD]US6108992  (SHAW JOHN G [CA]) [AD] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006194062  (AKITA SEKIZAI KK) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 1,6,7,10 *;
 [A]US2009193738  (KORTUEM MATT [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * figures 4-6,9 * * paragraphs [0053] , [0055] *;
 [A]US2001054263  (COULTON MICHAEL S [US]) [A] 1-28 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0022] *
by applicantUS6108992