Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2739154

EP2739154 - VITAMIN B6 DERIVATIVES OF NUCLEOTIDES, ACYCLONUCLEOTIDES AND ACYCLONUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MBC Pharma, Inc.
12635 East Montview Blvd., Suite 100
Aurora, CO 80045 / US
[2014/24]
Inventor(s)01 / KARPEISKY, Alexander
420 Vernier Avenue
Lafayette, CO 80026 / US
02 / ZINNEN, Shawn
2080 Grape Street
Denver, CO 80207 / US
03 / URLAM, Murali
9123 E. Mississippi Avenue
Apt. 3-303
Denver, CO 80247 / US
04 / VVEDENSKY, Vladimir, Y.
9290 Towne Centre Drive
Unit 89
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
05 / GUZAEV, Andrei, P.
25638 Rue De Lac
Escondido, CA 92026 / US
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/26]
Former [2014/24]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12820544.001.08.2012
[2018/26]
WO2012US49181
Priority number, dateUS201161513741P01.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161513741 P
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013019874
Date:07.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2739154
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2739154
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.02.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/10, C07H19/20, A61K31/7064, A61K31/7076, A61P29/00, A61P31/00, A61P33/00, A61P35/00
[2018/03]
Former International [2014/24]A01N57/00, A61K31/675
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VITAMIN-B6-DERIVATE VON NUKLEOTIDEN, ACYCLONUKLEOTIDEN UND ACYCLONUCLEOSID-PHOSPHONATEN[2014/24]
English:VITAMIN B6 DERIVATIVES OF NUCLEOTIDES, ACYCLONUCLEOTIDES AND ACYCLONUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHONATES[2014/24]
French:DÉRIVÉS À BASE DE VITAMINE B6 DE NUCLÉOTIDES, D'ACYCLONUCLÉOTIDES ET DE PHOSPHONATES D'ACYCLONUCLÉOSIDES[2014/24]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2014National basic fee paid 
28.02.2014Search fee paid 
28.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/24]
17.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2018Fee for grant paid
15.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2017
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
LU01.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/21]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
LU01.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/15]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
IT27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1918282  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-11 * page 1 * * page 11 * * example 3 *;
 [Y]  - SOFIA M J, "Nucleotide prodrugs for HCV therapy", ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY & CHEMOTHERAPY,, (20110516), vol. 22, doi:10.3851/IMP1797, ISSN 0956-3202, pages 23 - 49, XP009162098 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3851/IMP1797
 [Y]  - Uridine Diphosphopyridoxal ET AL, "A New Affinity Labeling Reagent for the Active Site of Glycogen Synthase", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19850610), pages 6670 - 6676, URL: http://www.jbc.org/content/260/11/6670.full.pdf, (20141015), XP055146731 [Y] 1-11 * page 1; figure 1 *
International search[A]US2009239814  (MANOHARAN MUTHIAH [US], et al);
 [A]US5434143  (SPIELVOGEL BERNARD F [US], et al)
by applicantDE1918282
    - M.J. SOFIA, "Nucleotide prodrugs for HCV therapy", Antiviral Chemistry & Chemotherapy, (20110000), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.3851/IMP1797, pages 23 - 49, XP009162098

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3851/IMP1797
    - M. TAGAYA et al., The Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19850000), vol. 260, no. 11, pages 6670 - 6676
    - SAID, H.M.; ORTIZ, A.; MA, T.Y., "A carrier-mediated mechanism for pyridoxine uptake by human intestinal epithelial Caco-2 cells: regulation by a PKA-mediated pathway", Am J Physiol Cell Physiol, (20030000), vol. 285, pages C1219 - 1225
    - LUDWIG, PETER S.; SCHWENDENER, RETO A.; SCHOTT; HERBERT, Synthesis, (20020000), no. 16, pages 2387 - 2392
    - STRYER, L., "Flow of Genetic Information", Biochemistry, (19950000), vol. 5, pages 95 - 97
    - STRYER, L., "DNA and RNA: Molecules of Heredity", Biochemistry, (19950000), vol. 76, no. 80-83, page 75
    - SIDDIQUI et al., "Design and Synthesis of Lipophilic Phosphoramidate d4T-MP Prodrugs Expressing High Potency Against HIV in Cell Culture: Structural Determinants for in Vitro Activity and QSAR", J Med Chem, (19990000), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1021/jm9807104, pages 4122 - 4128, XP000999173

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9807104
    - REMY et al., "Studies on fluroinated pyrimidines. XIV. The synthesis of derivatives of 5-fluoro-2'-deoxyuridine 5'- phosphate and related compounds", J Org Chem, (19620000), vol. 27, pages 2491 - 2500, XP002584044
    - LEHSTEN et al., "An improved procedure for the synthesis of nucleoside amidates", Organic Process Research & Development, (20020000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1021/OP025562C, pages 819 - 822, XP002584043

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OP025562C
    - JUODKA et al., "Oligonucleotides and nucleotide-peptide. XXXIV. Synthesis and some properties of complex nucleotidyl (oligonucleotidyl)-(P—►N)-aminoacids (peptides) and their ehtyl esters", J Carbohydrates Nucleosides Nucleotides, (19790000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 333 - 357
    - MCGUIGAN et al., "Synthesis and Evaluation of some masked phosphate esters of the anti-herpesvirus drug 882C (Netivudine) as potential antiviral agents", Antiviral Cheimistry & Chemotherapy, (19980000), vol. 9, pages 233 - 243
    - JUODKA et al., "Oligonucleotides and nucleotide-peptides. XXXVII. On the Mechanism of Hydrolysis of Uridylyl-(5'..N)-amino acids. Intramolecular catalysis by the a-carboxyl group of amino acids", J Carbohydrates Nucleosides Nucleotides, (19810000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 519 - 535, XP009099165
    - NEGISHI et al., "N4-Aminocytidine, a Nucleoside Analog that has an Exceptionally High Mutagenic Activity", Nucleic Acids Research, (19930000), vol. 11, no. 15, pages 5223 - 5233
    - LIORANCAITE et al., "Synthesis and Some Properties of Oligonucleotidyl-(Pm->N)-Serines", Nucleic Acids Symposium Series, (19810000), vol. 9, pages 215 - 18, XP000564460
    - ZHOU et al., "Simultaneous Formation of Peptides and Nucleotides from N-Phosphothreonine", Origins of Life and Evolution of the Bioshphere, (19960000), vol. 26, pages 547 - 560
    - GROMOVA et al., "Optical Rotary Dispersion and Circular Dichroism of Mono-and Oligonucleotide-Amino Acids (Amidates", Biochim Biophys Acta, (19710000), vol. 240, pages 1 - 11
    - JOUDKA et al., "Oligonucleotides and Nucleotide-Peptides. XXXV. Some Properties of Nucleotidyl-(5'->N)-Amino Acid Esters Differing in Amino Acid and Nucleotide Components 1", J Carbohydrates Nucleosides Nucleotides, (19810000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 19 - 39, XP009099178
    - ABRAHAM et al., "Synthesis and Biological Activity of Aromatic Amino Acid Phosphoramidates of 5-Fluoro-2'-deoxyuridine and 1-beta-Arabinofuranosylcytosine: Evidence of Phosphoramidase Activity", J Med Chem, (19960000), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1021/jm9603680, pages 4569 - 4575, XP002147029

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9603680
    - SA HARRIS et al., "Synthesis and antiviral evaluation of phosphoramidate derivatives of (E)-5-(2-bromovinyl)-2'-deoxyuridine", Antiviral Chemistry and Chemotherapy, (20010000), vol. 12, pages 293 - 300, XP008037325
    - EDWARD J. MCINTEE et al., "Amino Acid Phosphoramidate Nucleosides: Potential ADEPT/GDEPT Substrates", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20010000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00513-3, pages 2803 - 2805, XP055023645

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00513-3
    - LISA J. WHALEN et al., "Synthesis and Evaluation of Phosphoramidate Amino Acid-Based Inhibitors of Sialyltransferases", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20030000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(02)00735-7, pages 301 - 304, XP002495584

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(02)00735-7
    - DAVID B. LACKEY et al., "Enzyme-catalyzed therapeutic agent (ECTA) design: activation of the antitumor ECTA compound NB 1011 by thymidylate synthase", Biochemical Pharacology, (20010000), vol. 61, pages 179 - 189
    - HARRIS et al., Antiviral Chemistry and Chemotherapy, (20010000), vol. 12, pages 293 - 300